NY A02086 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain persons convicted of article six-C of the correction law as serving as a trustee, principal, officer, or member of a board of education of any public school in any BOCES, city, union free, common or central school district or any charter school.
Title
Prohibits certain persons convicted of article six-C of the correction law as serving as a trustee, principal, officer, or member of a board of education of any public school in any BOCES, city, union free, common or central school district or any charter school.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | print number 2086a |
2011-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01857 (Same As) 2012-03-29 - referred to correction