NY A02080 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promotional exams.
Title
Relates to promotional exams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.777 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S01627 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS