NY A02071 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to student loan servicers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to student loan servicers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-14Assemblyprint number 2071c
2019-03-14Assemblyamend and recommit to banks
2019-03-13Assemblyprint number 2071b
2019-03-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to banks
2019-01-29Assemblyprint number 2071a
2019-01-29Assemblyamend and recommit to banks
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S01958 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02071&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02071&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02071
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02071&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02071A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02071&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02071B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02071&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02071C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02071&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback