NY A02065 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - substituted by s3666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - substituted by s3666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates unreasonable fees levied on tenants for reproductions of keys by preventing landlords from charging tenants more than 110% of the actual cost for the reproduction of such keys.
Title
Eliminates unreasonable fees levied on tenants for reproductions of keys by preventing landlords from charging tenants more than 110% of the actual cost for the reproduction of such keys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Assembly | substituted by s3666 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.248 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03666 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.345