NY A02065 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.746
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to discrimination against owners of specific breeds of dogs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to discrimination against owners of specific breeds of dogs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.746
2016-05-25Assemblyreported
2016-05-19Assemblyprint number 2065a
2016-05-19Assemblyamend and recommit to housing
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to housing
2015-06-03Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-01-15Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S05944 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - PRINT NUMBER 5944A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback