NY A02064 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08Assemblyreported
2019-02-06Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2019-02-05Assemblyreported referred to judiciary
2019-01-24Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02072 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback