NY A02064 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Title
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.181 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | substituted for a2064 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.140 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | substituted by s2072 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.181 |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02072 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY