NY A02064 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the eighth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.
Title
Relates to early voting; provides that beginning the eighth day prior to any election and ending on and including the second day prior to the election a person duly registered and eligible to vote shall be permitted to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.184 |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02950 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN