NY A02064 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the adoption of rules and regulations by state and local government entities prior to the effective date of an act of the legislature which necessitates such rules, regulations or actions.
Title
Permits the adoption of rules and regulations by state and local government entities prior to the effective date of an act of the legislature which necessitates such rules, regulations or actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] |
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.90 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-03-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.80 |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04904 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS