NY A02060 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every mandated reporter to make a report to the register unless the register has knowledge of the incident.
Title
Requires every mandated reporter to make a report to the register unless the register has knowledge of the incident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.525 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | print number 2060a |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | reference changed to mental health |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03410 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES