NY A02056 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the crime of unlawful dissemination or publication of an intimate image and creates a private right of action for such crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the crime of unlawful dissemination or publication of an intimate image and creates a private right of action for such crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2019-03-06Assemblyrecommitted to codes
2019-02-12Assemblyamended on third reading 2056b
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.27
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-24Assemblyprint number 2056a
2019-01-24Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S01719 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5981

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback