NY A02029 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.977
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing notice of crude oil shipments to major facilities.
Title
Relates to providing notice of crude oil shipments to major facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.977 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04560 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION