NY A02020 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s6373b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s6373b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for mental injury premised upon extraordinary work-related stress incurred at work; applies to all workers.
Title
Relates to claims for mental injury premised upon extraordinary work-related stress incurred at work; applies to all workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s6373b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.600 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 2020a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06373 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.191