NY A02017 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local governments to prepare and adopt an affordable housing plan no later than December 31, 2024; defines local government as a city, town or village; requires plan to identify the regional need for affordable housing, as well as such need within the local government; makes related requirements; directs such local governments to hold at least one public hearing on the draft plan and one public hearing on the final plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires local governments to prepare and adopt an affordable housing plan no later than December 31, 2024; defines local government as a city, town or village; requires plan to identify the regional need for affordable housing, as well as such need within the local government; makes related requirements; directs such local governments to hold at least one public hearing on the draft plan and one public hearing on the final plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09072 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT