NY A02014 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - signed chap.111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - signed chap.111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defining certain qualifying conditions for veterans; includes individuals licensed to provide health care services within the state of New York as someone a veteran may disclose military sexual trauma to.
Title
Relates to defining certain qualifying conditions for veterans; includes individuals licensed to provide health care services within the state of New York as someone a veteran may disclose military sexual trauma to.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Assembly | signed chap.111 |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1265 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S448 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.74 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00448 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2014