NY A02005 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the legislature to require a state or municipal entity to enact a period of residency requirement for persons applying for certain social services.
Title
Authorizes the legislature to require a state or municipal entity to enact a period of residency requirement for persons applying for certain social services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to social services |