NY A02002 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential health care facilities to update residents, authorized family members, and guardians of residents of the presence of an infection and to have in their pandemic emergency plan a plan or procedure for designating a separate cohort area.
Title
Requires residential health care facilities to update residents, authorized family members, and guardians of residents of the presence of an infection and to have in their pandemic emergency plan a plan or procedure for designating a separate cohort area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | print number 2002b |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | print number 2002a |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |