NY A02001 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - substituted by s1197
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the inclusion of claims for unemployment insurance arising from the closure of an employer due to COVID-19 from being included in such employer's experience rating charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the inclusion of claims for unemployment insurance arising from the closure of an employer due to COVID-19 from being included in such employer's experience rating charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26Assemblysubstituted by s1197
2021-01-26Assemblyrules report cal.9
2021-01-26Assemblyreported
2021-01-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-01-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-01-21Assemblyprint number 2001a
2021-01-21Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to labor
2021-01-14Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S01197 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.21

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A2001
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02001&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02001
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02001&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02001A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02001&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02001&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02001&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback