NY A02001 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adoption by a petitioner where such petitioner's parentage is legally-recognized.
Title
Relates to adoption by a petitioner where such petitioner's parentage is legally-recognized.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.150 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.321 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05142 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES