NY A01974 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - print number 1974a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - print number 1974a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to establish a language assistance program for limited English proficient parents of students; requires record keeping and annual reporting; permits districts to jointly establish such programs.
Title
Requires school districts to establish a language assistance program for limited English proficient parents of students; requires record keeping and annual reporting; permits districts to jointly establish such programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Assembly | print number 1974a |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02630 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 2630A