NY A01973 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires landlords to mitigate damages if a tenant vacates a premises in violation of the terms of the lease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires landlords to mitigate damages if a tenant vacates a premises in violation of the terms of the lease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-29Assemblyamended on third reading 1973a
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.26
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02949 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2949A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback