NY A01970 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits more than one increase in the price of motor fuel in any twenty-four hour period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits more than one increase in the price of motor fuel in any twenty-four hour period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2012-03-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-03-05Assemblypassed assembly
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.86
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-06-23SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-23Assemblypassed assembly
2011-05-05Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.246
2011-05-03Assemblyreported
2011-04-11Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-01-12Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S00603 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback