NY A01963 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a committee on safety within the metropolitan transportation authority.
Title
Establishes a committee on safety within the metropolitan transportation authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.575 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.91 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.74 |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03875 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION