NY A01962 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the promulgation of rules and regulations establishing minimum standards for the construction or improvement of correctional facilities and the care, custody, correction, treatment, supervision, discipline, and other correctional programs for all persons confined in such facilities; allows counties flexibility in establishing minimum staffing ratios.
Title
Relates to the promulgation of rules and regulations establishing minimum standards for the construction or improvement of correctional facilities and the care, custody, correction, treatment, supervision, discipline, and other correctional programs for all persons confined in such facilities; allows counties flexibility in establishing minimum staffing ratios.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05477 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
S08120 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
S08120 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION