NY A01960 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits price gouging on kosher for Passover products; authorizes the department of agriculture and markets to investigate instances of price gouging on such products and to conduct an annual Passover price survey to determine instances of price gouging; authorizes the attorney general to bring an action to stop the alleged price gouging and provides for a civil penalty of $10,000 for an instance of price gouging; establishes a defense to the charge.
Title
Prohibits price gouging on kosher for Passover products; authorizes the department of agriculture and markets to investigate instances of price gouging on such products and to conduct an annual Passover price survey to determine instances of price gouging; authorizes the attorney general to bring an action to stop the alleged price gouging and provides for a civil penalty of $10,000 for an instance of price gouging; establishes a defense to the charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04881 (Same As) 2017-03-03 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE