NY A01958 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - substituted by s298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - substituted by s298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designated viewers of audits provided to the federal clearinghouse.
Title
Relates to designated viewers of audits provided to the federal clearinghouse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Assembly | substituted by s298 |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.182 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00298 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.288