NY A01952 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-01 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds an optional section to voter registration forms to allow for email addresses.
Title
Adds an optional section to voter registration forms to allow for email addresses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.90 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.464 |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04330 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07071 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S07071 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES