NY A01945 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a time period in which an action to recover damages for injury arising from domestic violence must be brought.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a time period in which an action to recover damages for injury arising from domestic violence must be brought.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14Senate3RD READING CAL.186
2019-05-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2416
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.58
2019-02-11Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02416 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1945

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01945&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01945&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01945
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01945&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01945&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1945#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01945&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback