NY A01940 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the number of authorized withdrawal transactions at no charge from basic banking accounts for account holders sixty-five years of age or older from eight to twelve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the number of authorized withdrawal transactions at no charge from basic banking accounts for account holders sixty-five years of age or older from eight to twelve.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-21Senate3RD READING CAL.414
2019-05-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2245
2019-05-13SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2019-05-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.283
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S02245 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1940

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback