NY A01935 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to notify a customer thirty days prior to charging a fee based on account inactivity; requires such notice to include a telephone number and the full contact information of a representative of the financial institution responsible for resolving any matter relating to the fee.
Title
Requires financial institutions to notify a customer thirty days prior to charging a fee based on account inactivity; requires such notice to include a telephone number and the full contact information of a representative of the financial institution responsible for resolving any matter relating to the fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S04188 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.268