NY A01934 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the discoverability of recordings found on police body worn cameras and vehicle cameras.
Title
Relates to the discoverability of recordings found on police body worn cameras and vehicle cameras.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 1934a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00727 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES