NY A01932 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: No history available
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: No history available
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends period during which health maintenance organization enrollees may continue to receive services from a health care provider who disaffiliates from 60 or 90 days to 1 year, or in case of terminal illness, until the time of such insured's death; bars incentives which induce a provider to provide health care to an enrollee in a manner inconsistent with law.
Title
Extends period during which health maintenance organization enrollees may continue to receive services from a health care provider who disaffiliates from 60 or 90 days to 1 year, or in case of terminal illness, until the time of such insured's death; bars incentives which induce a provider to provide health care to an enrollee in a manner inconsistent with law.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.72 |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to health |