NY A01929 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to state government integrity including the creation of a New York state government integrity commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to state government integrity including the creation of a New York state government integrity commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2021-01-21Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2021-01-13Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00855 (Same As) 2021-01-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback