NY A01928 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits medical assistance providers from refusing to furnish care, services or supplies to any person who is entitled to receive such care, services or supplies under this title if such medical assistance provider furnishes the same care, services or supplies under the Medicare program pursuant to title XVIII of the federal social security act and the person is dually eligible under that program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits medical assistance providers from refusing to furnish care, services or supplies to any person who is entitled to receive such care, services or supplies under this title if such medical assistance provider furnishes the same care, services or supplies under the Medicare program pursuant to title XVIII of the federal social security act and the person is dually eligible under that program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-23Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S08885 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback