NY A01928 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the Governor's annual budget proposal to the Legislature shall include statements of any new legislation, amendment to legislation, or limitation on the effect of any legislation contained in the budget; makes related provisions granting the legislature an equal role with the governor in the budget process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the Governor's annual budget proposal to the Legislature shall include statements of any new legislation, amendment to legislation, or limitation on the effect of any legislation contained in the budget; makes related provisions granting the legislature an equal role with the governor in the budget process.

Sponsors

Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Mark Walczyk [R]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]
Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Robert Smullen [R]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Mary Walsh [R]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. John Lemondes [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2021-01-21Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2021-01-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S00820 (Same As) 2021-01-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback