NY A01927 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s679a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s679a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of addiction services and supports.
Title
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of addiction services and supports.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] |
Asm. Maritza Davila [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s679a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.798 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | print number 1927a |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S00679 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.123