NY A01921 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-25)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s1519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.

Sponsors

Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]
Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Kieran Lalor [R]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]
Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]
Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]
Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Joseph Angelino [R]
Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. John Lemondes [R]Asm. Josh Jensen [R]Asm. Michael Lawler [R]
Asm. William Barclay [R]Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Christopher Friend [R]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Andrew Goodell [R]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]
Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Mary Walsh [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02Assemblysubstituted by s1519
2021-06-02Assemblyrules report cal.295
2021-06-02Assemblyreported
2021-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-13Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S01519 (Same As) 2021-10-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.25

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A1921
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01921&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01921
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01921&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01921&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01921&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01921&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback