NY A01914 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 creating the digital currency task force to increase the members from 9 to 13.
Title
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 creating the digital currency task force to increase the members from 9 to 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.195 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-02-26 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.40 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | substituted for a1914 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to banks |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.14 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | substituted by s1194 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.40 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S01194 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.195