NY A01904 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the office of the correctional ombudsman to achieve transparency, fairness, impartiality and accountability in New York state correctional facilities; relates to reports by coroners; designates investigators of the office of the correctional ombudsman as peace officers; authorizes the attorney general to investigate the alleged commission of any criminal offense committed by an employee of the department of corrections and community supervision in connection with his or her official duties; relates to the confidentiality of certain records; and includes the office of the correctional ombudsman records within the definition of public safety agency records; makes related provisions.
Title
Creates the office of the correctional ombudsman to achieve transparency, fairness, impartiality and accountability in New York state correctional facilities; relates to reports by coroners; designates investigators of the office of the correctional ombudsman as peace officers; authorizes the attorney general to investigate the alleged commission of any criminal offense committed by an employee of the department of corrections and community supervision in connection with his or her official duties; relates to the confidentiality of certain records; and includes the office of the correctional ombudsman records within the definition of public safety agency records; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.142 |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.47 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |