NY A01899 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - substituted by s749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - substituted by s749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.
Title
Awards attorney's fees and expert witness fees in appropriate cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Assembly | substituted by s749 |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.72 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00749 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.30