NY A01895 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to creating the New York electronic communications privacy act; relates to the search and seizure of electronic devices and electronic communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to creating the New York electronic communications privacy act; relates to the search and seizure of electronic devices and electronic communications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-10Assemblyprint number 1895a
2017-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2017-01-13Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S05730 (Same As) 2017-04-27 - REFERRED TO CODES
S06044 (Same As) 2017-05-10 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback