NY A01891 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to liability and related penalties for illegal conversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to liability and related penalties for illegal conversion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to housing
2017-06-19Assemblyprint number 1891b
2017-06-19Assemblyamend and recommit to housing
2017-06-13Assemblyprint number 1891a
2017-06-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to housing
2017-01-13Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S06693 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback