NY A01890 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prevention of discrimination; replaces the term "sexual harassment" with "discrimination".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prevention of discrimination; replaces the term "sexual harassment" with "discrimination".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2019-03-06Assemblyrecommitted to ways and means
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.56
2019-02-11Assemblyreported
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01915 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback