NY A01890 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prevention of discrimination; replaces the term "sexual harassment" with "discrimination".
Title
Relates to the prevention of discrimination; replaces the term "sexual harassment" with "discrimination".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | recommitted to ways and means |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.56 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01915 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE