NY A01874 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the manner in which certain provisions of the correction law are enforced.
Title
Relates to the manner in which certain provisions of the correction law are enforced.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.82 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.367 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00968 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES