NY A01865 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be printed in large font type.
Title
Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be printed in large font type.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.360 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02747 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION