NY A01864 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of voting systems by municipalities; provides for the determination of actual expenses of the board.
Title
Relates to the use of voting systems by municipalities; provides for the determination of actual expenses of the board.
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.418 |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07859 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS