NY A01863 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - signed chap.440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to provisions of law relating to applications for licenses.
Title
Makes technical corrections to provisions of law relating to applications for licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Assembly | signed chap.440 |
2021-09-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.634 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3925 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.139 |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03925 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1863