NY A01860 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to information provided to unlicensed or unregistered child day care providers by the office of children and family services; requires all applications for a license/registration to be available in several languages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to information provided to unlicensed or unregistered child day care providers by the office of children and family services; requires all applications for a license/registration to be available in several languages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-03-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-03-30Senate3RD READING CAL.553
2021-03-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5081
2021-02-22SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2021-02-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-02-22Assemblypassed assembly
2021-02-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.97
2021-02-09Assemblyreported
2021-01-11Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S05081 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1860

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback