NY A01823 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that if it appears that a death may have resulted from the commission of a crime, the coroner or medical examiner in any county with geographic jurisdiction over the crime shall have concurrent jurisdiction and authority to investigate the death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that if it appears that a death may have resulted from the commission of a crime, the coroner or medical examiner in any county with geographic jurisdiction over the crime shall have concurrent jurisdiction and authority to investigate the death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-03-25Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-25Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.150
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-17Assemblyreferred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback